IL HB1595 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 20%, but in no event to exceed $2,000, of the gross wages paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year to each creditable employee. Provides that a "creditable employee" is an employee who: (1) was employed by the taxpayer for the first time on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act; (2) completed his or her twenty-fourth consecutive month of employment with the taxpayer during the taxable year; (3) received unemployment benefits in this State for at least 2 months immediately prior to being hired by the taxpayer; and (4) was employed at a location in this State for at least 30 hours per week during the entire 24-month period of his or her employment with the taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-JOB DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1595&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1595.htm |