IL HB1604 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. In provisions concerning choice of title insurance company, provides that it is the public policy of the State that parties to a contract for the sale of residential real property who are obligated to pay for certain products and services related to title insurance (rather than title insurance) have the right to also choose the independent escrowee that will provide those products and services. Makes conforming changes. Provides that for a county with a population not less than 500,000, a transaction for the sale and purchase or residential real property, the title insurance company issuing the owner's title insurance policy shall issue the lender's title insurance policy for that transaction if the policy is required by the lender. Provides an exception to that if the buyer and seller agree otherwise or the buyer or seller is offered a discount of fees as an inducement to split the title insurance policies, unless the title insurance company issuing the owner's policy agrees to offer the same discount of fees.
Title
TITLE INS-CHOICE OF COMPANY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-15 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 18.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1604&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1604.htm |