IL HB1614 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the threshold amount of theft not from the person and retail theft that enhances the offense from a misdemeanor to a felony to $2,000. Provides that an enhancement from a misdemeanor to a felony based on a prior conviction must only be for felony theft.
Title
CRIM CD-THEFT&RETAIL THEFT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1614&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1614.htm |