IL HB1616 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that immediately upon arrival at a police station or other place where an arrestee is detained, but no later than one hour after arrival, an arrested person has the right to make at least 3 completed telephone calls at no expense to himself or herself. Provides that an arrested person must be given access to a phone within one hour of arrival at a police station or any other place where detained by law enforcement. Provides that at every police facility where an arrestee may be detained, a sign containing at minimum, the following information in bold block type must be posted in a conspicuous place: (1) a short statement notifying an arrestee of his or her right to have access to a phone within one hour of arrival at the police station; (2) that an arrestee has the right to make at least 3 completed phone calls at no expense to himself or herself; and (3) that phone calls can be made to an attorney, relative, or acquaintance. Provides that in addition to the information required, if the police station is located in a jurisdiction where the court has appointed the public defender or other attorney to represent an arrestee, the telephone number to the public defender or appointed attorney's office must also be displayed. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM PRO-COMMUNICATION
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 103-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1616&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1616.htm |