IL HB1628 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that as a condition of initial eligibility for medical assistance benefits provided under the State's Medical Assistance program or, subject to federal approval, benefits provided under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), an applicant must pass a drug screening. Provides that as a condition of continued eligibility for such benefits, a recipient must pass random drug screenings as prescribed by the Department of Human Services. Requires the Department to adopt rules requiring applicants for TANF benefits or SNAP benefits to actively seek work in order to qualify for such benefits. Provides that the rules adopted by the Department shall be in compliance with those rules under the Unemployment Insurance Act and adopted by the Department of Employment Security requiring unemployed individuals to actively seek employment in order to qualify for unemployment insurance benefits. Requires the Department to adopt rules that allow recipients of TANF benefits or SNAP benefits to experience a gradual reduction in benefits as earnings increase. Increases the penalties for using another person's cash assistance benefits or SNAP benefits. Contains provisions requiring photo identification when using a LINK card to obtain SNAP benefits or cash. Provides that no recipient of TANF benefits shall use his or her benefits to purchase lottery tickets or to patronize any casino or licensed establishment that operates video gaming terminals for the purpose of engaging in gambling or video gaming activities.
Title
MEDICAID-SNAP-DRUG TEST-LINK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | To Public Benefits Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 1-10.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-4.4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 4-8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-4B | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-5A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1628&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1628.htm |