IL HB1637 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Keep Illinois Families Together Act. Provides that the Attorney General, within 90 days of the effective date of this Act, in consultation with the appropriate stakeholders, shall propose new rules related to limiting assistance with immigration enforcement at the following facilities to the fullest extent possible consistent with federal and State law to ensure that these facilities remain safe and accessible to all Illinois residents, regardless of immigration status: (1) public schools, including public pre-schools and other early learning programs, public elementary and secondary schools, and public institutions of higher education; (2) State-funded medical treatment and health care facilities, including hospitals, health clinics, emergency or urgent care facilities, nursing homes, group homes for persons with developmental disabilities, community-integrated living arrangements, and State mental health facilities; (3) public libraries; (4) facilities operated by the Office of the Secretary of State; and (5) courthouses. Provides that within 6 months of the effective date of the Act, all State agencies, public schools, and public institutions of higher education shall review their confidentiality policies to identify any changes necessary to limit collection of information from individuals to that information necessary to perform agency duties and to limit use or disclosure of information for any other purpose. Provides that a law enforcement agency or official may not inquire about the citizenship or immigration status or place of birth of any individual, including any person who has been arrested or detained by the agency, any person in the agency or official's custody, any person submitting to questioning by the agency or official, any crime victim, any witness, or any person who calls or approaches the law enforcement agency or official seeking assistance. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRATION STATUS-ACCESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0019
2019-06-21HouseEffective Date June 21, 2019
2019-06-21HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-06HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-019-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-05-29SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-004-000
2019-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-05-28SenateArrive in Senate
2019-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-050-000
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-07HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-09HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-02-26HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-21HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback