IL HB1639 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in an Article concerning accident and health insurance. Provides that "policy of individual or group accident and health insurance" does not include any coverage or policy that provides an excepted benefit, as defined in the federal Public Health Service Act. Provides that the amendatory Act does not apply to certain policies of insurance. Repeals provisions that state that specified provisions of the Article do not apply to short-term travel, disability income, long-term care, accident only, or limited or specified disease policies. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD- EXCEPTED BENEFIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0456 |
2019-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-030-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 018-001-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Back To Insurance Committee; |
2019-02-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 352b | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |