IL HB1645 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits misrepresentation of a service animal when he or she knowingly represents, expressly or impliedly, that the animal is a service animal for the purpose of securing the rights and privileges afforded to a person with a disability accompanied by a service animal and the person knew or should have known that the animal is not a service animal. Provides that the refusal to answer questions from a law enforcement officer permitted under federal regulation creates a permissive inference that the animal is not a service animal and the law enforcement officer may require the person to remove the animal from the place of public accommodation. Misrepresentation of a service animal is a petty offense. Defines "service animal".
Title
MISREPRESENT-SERVICE ANIMAL
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1645&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1645.htm |