IL HB1656 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "personal identifying information" for purposes of identity theft to include (1) any information regarding an individual's medical history, mental or physical condition, or medical treatment or diagnosis by a health care professional and (2) a person's health insurance policy number or subscriber identification number, any unique identifier used by a health insurer to identify a person, or any information in an individual's application and claims history, including, but not limited to, appeals history.
Title
CRIM-IDENTIFYING INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |