IL HB1873 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0055
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Doubles the fines for violations of the Section regarding approaching, overtaking, and passing school buses. Provides that a first violation of the Section or a local ordinance shall be subject to a mandatory fine of $300 (instead of $150) and a second or subsequent violation shall be subject to a mandatory fine of $1,000 (instead of $500).
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0055 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-001-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 074-016-012 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-001-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |