IL HB2032 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2020 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game for the purposes of upkeep, maintenance, and improvements to Illinois State and local parks. Provides that the net revenue from the special instant scratch-off game must be deposited into the Illinois Parks Scratch-off Fund. Provides that the moneys deposited in the Fund shall be used by the Department of Natural Resources for upkeep, maintenance, and improvements to Illinois State and local parks, including grants for those purposes. Authorizes the Department of the Lottery to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Amends the State Finance Act to create the Illinois Parks Scratch-off Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-STATE-LOCAL PARKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016052Amended CodeCitation Text
20160520Amended CodeCitation Text
20160521.12New CodeSee Bill Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback