IL HB2061 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that charges alleging a violation under provisions concerning employment may be filed and deemed timely if filed within 3 years after the date of the alleged violation. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-LIMITATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-20 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 7A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2061&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2061.htm |