IL HB2076 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2011 and ending on or before December 31, 2013, each taxpayer with an adjusted gross income of less than $250,000 is entitled to a credit in an amount not to exceed $7,500 if (i) the taxpayer purchases a newly constructed home during the taxable year, (ii) the home is the taxpayer's principal place of residence on the last day of the taxable year, and (iii) the assessed value of the residence is less than $500,000. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CREDIT-NEW CONSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2076&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2076.htm |