IL HB2076 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Prohibits the manufacture, distribution, or use of paper containing bisphenol A for the making of business or banking records. Requires paper manufacturers to, among other things, replace bisphenol A with an alternative chemical. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to gather and certify certain information about alternative chemicals. Requires the Agency to convene an Advisory Committee on Least Toxic Alternatives to Bisphenol A. Sets forth requirements that apply to members of the Committee. Delays the applicability of the prohibitions on the manufacture, distribution, and use of paper containing bisphenol A for the making of business or banking records if the United States Environmental Protection Agency has not identified a safe, commercially available alternative to bisphenol A prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-BPA-BUSINESS RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 027-000-000
2019-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-30SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 076-037-001
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-012-000
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.59New CodeSee Bill Text
415542Amended CodeCitation Text
415544Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback