IL HB2078 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following change: provides that, on or before January 31, 2020, the Professional Review Panel must submit a report to the General Assembly on how State funds and funds distributed under the evidence-based funding formula may aid the financial effects of the changes made by the amendatory Act.
Title
SCH CD-MINIMUM TEACHER SALARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0443 |
2019-08-22 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2020 |
2019-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 081-030-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-013-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-002-000 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-003-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-031-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |