IL HB2079 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, and the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the vendor discount amount under those Acts shall be 1.75%. Provides that the vendor discount may not exceed $1,000 per vendor in any calendar year. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VENDOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-28 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |