IL HB2103 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act and the Sanitary District Act of 1917. Provides that that the North Shore Water Reclamation District and sanitary districts may lease property not required for district use to others for a period not exceeding 50 years (rather than 20 years for the North Shore Water Reclamation District and 10 years for sanitary districts). Effective immediately.
Title
SANITARY DIST-PROPERTY LEASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0128 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2305 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2405 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |