IL HB2118 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Survivor Support and Trafficking Prevention Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the provisions of the Article are inoperative on and after June 30, 2022 (rather than June 30, 2019). Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-TRAFFICKING VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0246 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 16-7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |