IL HB2123 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that a food is misbranded if it contains sesame, is offered for sale in package form but not for immediate consumption, and the label does not include sesame.
Title
FOOD LABELING-SESAME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0129 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Re-assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 620 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |