IL HB2128 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who replace a lead water service pipe with a copper water service pipe at a qualified residence. Provides that the credit shall be equal to the lesser of (i) 25% of the cost of replacing the lead water service pipes in each taxable year for which the credit is taken or (ii) $2,500 in each such taxable year. Provides that the credit may be taken for the taxable year in which the pipes are replaced and in each of the next 3 consecutive years. Provides that the term "qualified residence" means a single family residence that is owned and occupied by the taxpayer as his or her primary residence. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LEAD PIPE REMOVAL
Sponsors
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2128&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2128.htm |