IL HB2142 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that until the consent of the adult's guardian has been obtained, counseling or psychotherapy provided to an adult under guardianship shall be limited to not more than 12 (rather than 5) sessions, a session lasting not more than 60 (rather than 45) minutes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDD CD-COUNSELING SESSIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0059
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date July 12, 2019
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-20SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-20SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40552-101.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback