IL HB2143 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall prepare a list of all affected municipalities, counties, and road districts receiving more than $1,500,000 in motor fuel tax revenue in the previous year. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000 in any State fiscal year beginning on or after July 1, 2019 shall receive any funds on or after July 1 of the third fiscal year to occur after the fiscal year in which the municipality, county, or road district received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000 unless, on or before June 30 of the second fiscal year the municipality, county, or road district received distributions totaling more than $2,000,000, that municipality, county, or road district implements a disadvantaged business enterprise program setting goals for the inclusion of minority, veteran, and female-owned businesses in the procurement of all contracts. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall publish and maintain on its website all relevant data for establishing regional goals for affected municipalities, counties, and road districts to implement business enterprise programs. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-BUSINESS ENTERPRISE DATA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2143&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2143.htm |