IL HB2151 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, if a person is convicted of a third or subsequent offense of operation of an insured motor vehicle and the offense causes, as a proximate result of the person's operation of the motor vehicle, the death of one or more persons, the person is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-UNINSURED FATALITY
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-001-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-707 | Amended Code | Citation Text |