IL HB2160 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0463
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires the Department of Insurance to develop a uniform electronic prior authorization form to be used by an insurer that provides prescription drug benefits when requiring prior authorization. Provides that the development of the uniform electronic prior authorization form shall include input from specified interested parties and that the Department of Insurance shall take into consideration certain existing prior authorization forms and national standards pertaining to electronic authorization. Includes procedures for when a completed and accurate uniform electronic prior authorization form is not accepted by the insurer. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to develop a uniform electronic prior authorization form to be used by a managed care organization that provides prescription drug benefits when requiring prior authorization. Provides that the development of the uniform electronic prior authorization form shall include input from specified interested parties and that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall take into consideration certain existing prior authorization forms and national standards pertaining to electronic authorization. Includes procedures for when a completed and accurate uniform electronic prior authorization form is not accepted by the managed care organization.
Title
DRUGS-PRIOR AUTHORIZATION FORM
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0463 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Back To Insurance Committee; |
2019-03-05 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-02-28 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 364.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12c | New Code | See Bill Text |