IL HB2167 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that a formerly convicted person may petition the Department of Human Rights for a grant of protected class status. Provides that the Department may grant protected class status to a formerly convicted person who meets the following conditions: the person has complied with each term and condition of his or her parole, mandatory supervised release, probation, or conditional discharge; the person has obtained a high school diploma or received a high school equivalency certificate; the person is employed or actively seeking employment or is enrolled in or has successfully completed a vocational training or college educational program; the person has not been convicted of a felony or misdemeanor within the last 5 years; and the person has completed all sanctions imposed upon him or her through due process of law. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules concerning what constitutes an intellectual or developmental disability that prevents the formerly convicted person from meeting some of the conditions and who is qualified to diagnose such a person. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules to carry out the provisions. Provides that protected class status previously granted to a formerly convicted person shall be revoked by the Department after notice and a hearing, if the formerly convicted person is subsequently convicted of a felony or misdemeanor. Provides that the revocation process shall be initiated by a petition that sets forth the date of the subsequent offense, description of the offense, date of conviction for the subsequent offense, and sentence imposed on the conviction. Provides that a copy of the petition and notice of the hearing date shall be served on the formerly convicted person.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-PRIOR CONVICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 7-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 7-114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2167&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2167.htm |