IL HB2168 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides for a reduction in the equalized assessed value of newly-constructed or rehabilitated rental property if the owner of the residential real property commits that, for a period of 10 years, at least 15% of the multifamily building's units will have rents that are at or below maximum rents and are occupied by households with household incomes at or below maximum income limits. Provides that the chief county assessment officer of a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants shall establish such a program, and the chief county assessment officer of a county with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants shall establish such a program upon passage of an ordinance by a majority vote of the county board. Sets forth application requirements and the amount of the reduction. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-RENTAL HOUSING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-07-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2168&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2168.htm |