IL HB2173 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Guaranty Fund Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a "covered claim" does not include a claim for fines and penalties paid to government authorities. Provides that the board of directors of the Illinois Insurance Guaranty Fund has the authority to assess to pay off a loan necessary to pay covered claims. Provides that if the loan is projected to be outstanding for 3 years or more, the board of directors has the authority to increase the assessment to 3% of net direct written premiums for the previous year until the loan has been paid in full. Makes changes in provisions that specify conditions under which the Fund is bound by certain settlements, releases, compromises, waivers, and final judgments. Provides that the Fund may also take legal action to recover from insurers and insureds in certain circumstances. Provides that the Fund may bring an action against certain third-party representatives of an insolvent insurer to obtain custody and control of all claim information related to the insolvent company. Provides that any person recovering under the Article and any insured whose liabilities are satisfied under the Article shall be deemed to have assigned the person's or insured's rights under the policy to the Fund to the extent of his or her recovery or satisfaction obtained from the Fund's payments. Provides that the Fund may also pay certain workers' compensation claims or any other third-party claims covered by a policy of an insolvent company on behalf of a high net worth insured and may recover from the high net worth insured through any action necessary to collect the full amount to the Fund's reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
IL INSURANCE GUARANTY FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0060 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date July 12, 2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 020-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 534.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 537.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 537.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |