IL HB2176 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0465
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Notary Public Act. Modifies the required disavowal of legal representation notice. Provides that the failure of a notary public to follow specified notice requirements shall result in a fine of $1,500 (currently, $1,000) for each written violation. Provides that a second (rather than third) violation shall result in permanent revocation of the commission of notary public (currently, a second violation results in suspension of notary authorization). Provides that prior to rendering notary public services to a person seeking such services, a notary public shall, in addition to any written or electronic notice, also give a verbal disavowal of legal representation that is substantially the same as the statement required for written and electronic advertisements of notary services. Provides that upon providing the verbal disavowal of legal representation, the person seeking notary services shall be provided with an acknowledgment form reciting the disavowal of legal representation, and be required to sign such form acknowledging that he or she has been advised and understands that the notary public is not a licensed attorney and is not otherwise authorized to provide legal advice or services. Provides that the acknowledgment form shall be prescribed by the Secretary of State and be made available in English and in the non-English language in which notary services were solicited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NOTARY PUBLIC-NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0465
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-09HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Celina Villanueva

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53123-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2176&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0465.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2176sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2176_04102019_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2176_05212019_042000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2176ham001_05292019_034000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback