IL HB2177 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, upon request, the school board of a school district that maintains grades 10 through 12 may posthumously award a diploma to any service member who was killed in action while performing active military duty in the armed forces of the United States if he or she: (1) resided in an area currently within the district; (2) left high school before graduating to serve in the armed forces of the United States; and (3) did not receive a high school diploma. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DIPLOMA-MILITARY-KIA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
2019-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Education; 011-000-000
2019-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-27Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback