IL HB2182 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VEH CD-HIGHWAY DESIGNATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-126.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-214 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |