IL HB2189 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Genetic Information Privacy Act. Provides that "genetic testing" includes direct-to-consumer commercial genetic testing. Provides that a company providing direct-to-consumer commercial genetic testing is prohibited from sharing any genetic test information or other personally identifiable information about a consumer with any health or life insurance company without written consent from the consumer.
Title
GENETIC PRIVACY-INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0132 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Back To Insurance Committee; |
2019-03-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-28 | House | To Special Subcommittee (INS) |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 513 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |