IL HB2192 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Rent Control Act. Establishes 6 regional rent control boards in the State. Provides for the election of 7 members to each board beginning in the 2021 consolidated election. Provides that a board shall establish regulations concerning rent stabilization rates for specified lessors and shall impose rent control registration fees to fund a Small Rental Property Owner Repairs and Improvement Fund. Includes enforcement provisions against landlords who charge rent in excess of amounts allowed by the Act. Limits home rule powers except in home rule units that enact a specified rent stabilization regime. Amends the Election Code making conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates rent-controlled and rental property capital improvement tax credits. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Creates procedures for terminating a tenancy or lease of one year or more after expiration of the lease. Provides that a lessor may terminate a lease and recover possession, after providing specified notice and monetary relocation assistance: if the lessor or a qualified relative will reside at the premises; if the lessor is going to substantially rehabilitate, remodel, or repair the premises; or if the lessor intends to demolish or permanently remove the premises from residential use. Provides for damages for failure to pay lessee relocation assistance or for failure to act in good faith in seeking to recover possession under the provisions. Provides that a demand or notice must be accessible to a lessor by being presented in the language of the lessor and contain a statement that the lessor may seek legal advice. Makes other changes. Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act. Effective immediately.
Title
RENT CONTROL-TENANCY PROCEDURE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-20 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 825 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-207.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 9-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2192&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2192.htm |