IL HB2207 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Officer Prohibited Activities Act. Provides that a unit of local government with taxing authority, or any person holding public office with that unit of local government, shall not use public resources or public funds to obstruct, fight, or challenge initiatives to consolidate, merge, or eliminate any unit of local government. Provides that State moneys shall be withheld from the unit of local government until the obstruction, fighting, or challenge is concluded.
Title
PUBLIC OFFICE-PROHIBITED ACTS
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-20 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 105 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 105 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2207&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2207.htm |