IL HB2208 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the maximum reduction for the senior homestead exemption is $9,000 in counties with a population of more than 500,000 but not more than 1,000,000, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, and $5,000 in all other counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of the City of Chicago or the county board of a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants may, by ordinance, increase the maximum reduction for the senior homestead exemption for property under the jurisdiction of that city or county to not more than $9,000. Provides that the maximum reduction for the general homestead exemption is $12,000 in counties with a population of more than 500,000 but not more than 1,000,000, $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, and $6,000 in all other counties. Provides that the corporate authorities of the City of Chicago or the county board of a county with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants may, by ordinance, increase the maximum reduction for the general homestead exemption for property under the jurisdiction of that city or county to not more than $12,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-HOMESTEAD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-06-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-28HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-170Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback