IL HB2209 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each tax bill shall contain a list of each tax increment financing (TIF) district in which the property is located and the dollar amount of tax due that is allocable to the TIF district. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-TIF INFO ON BILL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0134 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-28 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |