IL HB2212 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the county clerk shall abate property taxes levied by a unit of local government on property that is included in a neighborhood association that maintains the roads or sidewalks serving the property. Provides that the amount of the abatement shall be equal to the amount of property taxes levied by the unit of local government on that property for the purpose of maintaining roads or sidewalks. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ABATEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2212&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2212.htm |