IL HB2222 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that covered vehicle service provider personnel who treat and either release or transport to a health care facility an individual experiencing a suspected or an actual opioid overdose shall document in the patient's care report the date and time of the overdose, the location in latitude and longitude where the overdose victim was initially encountered, whether one or more doses of an opioid overdose reversal drug was administered, and whether the overdose was fatal or nonfatal when the overdose victim was initially encountered and during the transportation of the victim to a health care facility. Provides that a covered vehicle service provider shall also provide the information to a specified mapping application. Provides that the information documented by a covered vehicle service provider shall not be used in an opioid use-related criminal investigation or prosecution of the individual treated by the covered vehicle service provider personnel. Exempts from civil or criminal liability all covered vehicle service providers and covered vehicle service provider personnel who report the information in good faith. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
EMS SYSTEMS-OVERDOSE REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |