IL HB2239 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Southern Illinois University Management Act. Provides that both student members (rather than only one student member) of the Board of Trustees of Southern Illinois University shall be voting student members; makes conforming changes.
Title
SIU-BOARD OF TRUSTEES-MEMBERS
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0175 |
2019-07-30 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-006-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-006-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Remains in Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Higher Education Committee; 010-007-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 520 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |