IL HB2247 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0061
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides that subject to appropriation, the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health shall make available funding for the development and implementation of a comprehensive and coordinated continuum of community-based pilot programs for persons with or at risk for a mental health diagnosis that is sensitive to the needs of local communities. Provides that the funding shall allow for the development of one or more pilot programs that will support the development of local social media campaigns that focus on the prevention or promotion of mental wellness and provide linkages to mental health services, especially for those individuals who are uninsured or underinsured. Sets forth certain criteria a provider must meet to be considered for the pilot program, including the ability to: (i) implement the pilot program in an area that shows a high need or underutilization of mental health services; (ii) collaborate with other systems and government entities that exist in a community; and (iii) provide a presence staffed by mental health professionals in natural community settings, which includes any setting where an individual who has not been diagnosed with a mental illness typically spends time. Authorizes the Department to adopt and implement administrative rules necessary to carry out the pilot program.
Title
MHDDSA-FAMILY COUNSELING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0061 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 80 | 7-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
405 | 80 | Art. VII heading | New Code | See Bill Text |