IL HB2254 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Gun Storage Act. Provides that a firearm owner shall not store or keep any firearm in any premises unless the firearm is secured in a locked container, properly engaged so as to render the firearm inaccessible or unusable to any person other than the owner or other lawfully authorized user. Provides that if the firearm is carried by or under the control of the owner or other lawfully authorized user, then the firearm is deemed lawfully stored or kept. Provides that a violation is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $500. Provides that a violation is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000 if any person knows or reasonably should know that a minor, an at-risk person, or a prohibited person is likely to gain access to a firearm belonging to or under the control of that person and a minor, an at-risk person, or a prohibited person obtains the firearm. Provides that a violation is subject to a civil penalty not to exceed $10,000 if a minor, an at-risk person, or a prohibited person obtains a firearm and uses it to injure or cause the death of a person or uses the firearm in connection with a crime. Provides that any money received from the collection of a civil penalty shall be deposited in the Mental Health Fund. Makes corresponding changes in the Criminal Code of 2012.
Title
SAFE GUN STORAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2254&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2254.htm |