IL HB2258 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the prerequisites to receiving a high school diploma, provides that a pupil must complete one year chosen from music, art, foreign language, vocational education, or speech (rather than music, art, foreign language, or vocational education).
Title
SCH CD-REQUIRE HIGH SCH COURSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |