IL HB2275 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Removes language concerning impasse procedures involving an educational employer whose territorial boundaries are coterminous with those of a city having a population in excess of 500,000. Repeals provisions concerning subjects of collective bargaining with that educational employer. Effective immediately.
Title
ED EMPLOYEE-IMPASSE PROCEDURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-01-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-016-000 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-21 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-18 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-18 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000 |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 4.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |