IL HB2276 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person shall not smoke in a motor vehicle containing a person under 18 years of age, regardless of whether the vehicle is in motion, at rest, or has its windows down. Defines smoking as inhaling, exhaling, burning, or carrying a lighted cigarette, cigar, pipe, weed, plant, regulated narcotic, or other combustible substance. Provides that a police officer may not stop a motor vehicle solely for a violation of the Section. Provides that a violation is a petty offense with a maximum fine of $100 and that, for a second or subsequent offense, the fine is not to exceed $250.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SMOKING; PRESENT MINOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0468
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date June 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-014-000
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-29HouseArrived in House
2019-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-010-000
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2019-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-001-002
2019-05-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2019
2019-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
2019-05-22SenateDo Pass Public Health; 012-000-000
2019-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
2019-05-15SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Public Health
2019-05-07SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-020-000
2019-03-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-001-000
2019-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-11HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1432New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback