IL HB2287 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0136
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that an action may be commenced within 10 years of the last act committed in furtherance of the crime for an action arising out of: theft of property exceeding $100,000 in value; identity theft; aggravated identity theft; financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability; or other specific offenses in the Criminal Code of 2012. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
CIV PRO-PERSONAL ACTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0136 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-20 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 13-214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |