IL HB2293 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the money in the Marine Corps Scholarship Fund shall be paid to the Marine Corps Coordinating Council of Illinois, Inc. (instead of the Marine Corps Scholarship Foundation, Inc.). Authorizes the Marine Corps Coordinating Council of Illinois to provide grants to the Marine Corps Scholarship Foundation, the Young Marine National Foundation, and the various chapters of the Marine Corps League throughout the State. Provides that any grant money paid from the Marine Corps Scholarship Fund shall be used for any academic, financial assistance, or monetary award to veterans or veterans' families that are located within the State of Illinois. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-MARINE CORPS PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0089 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 19, 2019 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |