IL HB2303 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the registrant violation provisions of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that it is unlawful for any person knowingly to use or possess a prescriber's Illinois controlled substance license or United States Drug Enforcement Administration registration number: (A) other than for: (i) prescribing or dispensing controlled substances; (ii) insurance processing related to controlled substances; (iii) professional employment; (iv) collecting credentials data under the Health Care Professional Credentials Data Collection Act; or (v) licensure purposes; (B) without authorization; (C) to fraudulently obtain any medication or to fraudulently create a prescription or order; or (D) except as authorized by law. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony for the first offense and a Class 3 felony for each subsequent offense. The fine for the first offense shall be not more than $100,000. Provides that the fine for each subsequent offense shall not be more than $200,000.
Title
ILLEGAL PRESCRIBER LICENSE USE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |