IL HB2309 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act, the Civil No Contact Order Act, and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that when a petition for an emergency stalking no contact order, a civil no contact order, or an emergency order of protection is filed, the petition shall not be publicly available until the petition is served on the respondent. Provides that when a petition for an emergency stalking no contact order, a civil no contact order, or an emergency order of protection is granted, the order shall not be publicly available until the order is served on the respondent.
Title
PROTECTIVE ORDERS-SUPPRESS
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0255 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 21 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |