IL HB2315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Allows the Secretary of State to provide service by email of a document containing a driver's license number. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that Every Real ID compliant identification card or Real ID compliant Person with a Disability Identification Card issued under the Act to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident, other than a conditional resident, shall be marked "Limited Term". Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every Real ID compliant driver's license issued under this Code to an applicant who is not a United States citizen or permanent resident, other than a conditional resident, shall be marked "Limited Term". Defines "medical examiner's certificate". Provides that the Secretary shall deny, suspend, or revoke registration if the applicant fails to disclose material information required or if the applicant has made a materially false statement on the application, or the applicant has applied as a subterfuge for the real party in interest who has been issued a Federal out-of-service order or if the applicant's business is operated, managed or otherwise controlled or affiliated with a person who is ineligible for registration, including the applicant entity, a relative, family member, corporate officer or shareholder. The Secretary shall deny, suspend, or revoke registration for either a (i) vehicle if the motor carrier responsible for the safety of the vehicle has been prohibited from operating by the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration; or (ii) for a carrier whose business is operated, managed or otherwise controlled or affiliated with a person who is ineligible for registration, which may include the owner, a relative, family member, corporate officer, or shareholder of the carrier. Provides that any law enforcement agency, in addition to the Secretary of State, may seize or confiscate documents or plates issued by the Secretary upon expiration, revocation, cancellation or suspension thereof, or if it is fictitious, or if it has been unlawfully or erroneously issued. Provides requirements for consenting to accept service of documents by email.
Title
SOS-VARIOUS-ADMINISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0185 |
2019-08-02 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-014-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-002-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Remains in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-004-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 10-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 2-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-704 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-508.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |