IL HB2334 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a neglected minor includes any minor under the age of 12 (rather than 14) years whose parent or other person responsible for the minor's welfare leaves the minor without supervision for an unreasonable period of time without regard for the mental or physical health, safety, or welfare of that minor. Provides that neglect does not include permitting a child, whose basic needs are met and who is of sufficient age and maturity to avoid harm or unreasonable risk of harm, to engage in independent activities, including: (1) traveling to and from school, including by walking, running, or bicycling; (2) traveling to and from nearby commercial or recreational activities; (3) engaging in outdoor play; (4) remaining in a vehicle unattended, except as otherwise provided by law; (5) remaining at home unattended; or (6) engaging in a similar independent activity. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits child abandonment when he or she, as a parent, guardian, or other person having physical custody or control of a child, without regard for the mental or physical health, safety, or welfare of that child, knowingly leaves that child who is under the age of 12 (rather than 13) without supervision by a responsible person over the age of 14 for a period of 24 hours or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-NEGLECTED MINOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-07HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-06HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-21.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720512C-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback