IL HB2343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Healthy Workplace Act and amends the State Finance Act. Requires employers to provide specified paid sick days to employees. Sets forth the purposes for and manner in which the sick days may be used. Contains provisions regarding employer responsibilities, unlawful employer practices, and other matters. Provides that the Department of Labor shall administer the Act. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties. Authorizes individuals to file civil actions with respect to violations. Creates the Healthy Workplace Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTHY WORKPLACE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |